Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | To Subcommittee on Special Issues | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |