House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Gaming Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Gaming Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Gaming Committee; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Gaming Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|