Senate | 12/10/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 12/10/2023 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 25, 2023 | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |