House
|
11/26/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Rules Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|