Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0571
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Effective Date December 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|