Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - November 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 068-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|