Senate
|
11/17/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0565
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/17/2023
|
Effective Date November 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/17/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-015-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-036-001
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 040-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|