Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0884
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|