Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0546
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4, 5 - May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4, 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|