Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0075
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|