Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0482
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|