Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0751
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date August 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-017-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|