Senate
|
12/10/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 1 - November 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|