Senate
|
12/10/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|