Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0888
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; D. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|