Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0890
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|