Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0373
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-028-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 012-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 048-008-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-002-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|