Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0891
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 068-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|