Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0892
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|