Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |