Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will reamin in the Committee on Assignments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|