Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|