Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|