Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|