Senate | 06/26/2023 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |