Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Postponed - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |