Senate
|
07/18/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0651
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2024
|
Effective Date July 18, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 043-012-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 043-012-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 043-012-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3, 5 - May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3, 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-029-009
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 021-007-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 075-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|