Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|