Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0102
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Effective Date July 1, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Effective Date June 16, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 044-000-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-000-002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-031-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Motion Prevailed 072-031-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend House Rule(s) for Immediate Consideration Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 075-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|