Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Re-assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |