Senate | 04/15/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |