Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to State Government | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | To Subcommittee on State Gov. Special Issues | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to State Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |