Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |