Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | To Labor Subcommittee on Employment Security | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett |