Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|