Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0896
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 074-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|