House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|