Senate | 05/16/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |