Senate | 01/26/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller |