Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
To Subcommittee on Special Issues
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Privacy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
To Subcommittee on Privacy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|