Senate | 06/26/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Local Government; 007-004-000 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Postponed - Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |