Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|