Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Re-assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|