Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0378
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|