Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0087
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|