Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0486
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|