Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0379
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 034-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Racial Impact Note Request is Inapplicable
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Home Rule Note Request is Inapplicable
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Motion Prevailed 067-039-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Pension Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Judicial Note Filed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Fiscal Note Filed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Correctional Note Filed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|