House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|