Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0897
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Re-assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|