Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | To Subcommittee on Elections | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |